FL H0987 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2021-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2021-14)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises age restrictions relating to mail order, Internet, & remote sales of tobacco & nicotine products; expands authority of tobacco product enforcement officers to include nicotine products; revises signage requirements; preempts establishment of minimum age for purchasing or possessing tobacco or nicotine products to state; requires retail nicotine products dealers to obtain permit; provides restrictions on sale or delivery of nicotine products; provides civil & criminal penalties.
Title
Tobacco and Nicotine Products
Sponsors
House State Administration and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Jackie Toledo [R] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] |
Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1080 (Ch. 2021-14) |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-09 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-07 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-07 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-31 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-26 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-26 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-14
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
386 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |