FL S1080 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising age limitations relating to mail order, Internet, and remote sales of tobacco products; providing that it is unlawful for persons under 21 years of age to smoke tobacco or vape in, on, or within 1,000 feet of the real property comprising a public or private elementary, middle, or secondary school during specified hours; preempting the establishment of the minimum age for purchasing and possessing, and the regulation for the marketing, sale, or delivery of, tobacco products to the state; requiring proof of age for certain purchases of tobacco products; requiring retail nicotine product dealers to acquire a permit, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco and Nicotine Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#352 (Y: 103 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07 Approved by Governor
2021-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 103, NAYS 13
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 9
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateOrdered engrossed
2021-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (465114)
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-16SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-30SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-30SenateRemaining references corrected to Rules
2021-03-30SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateCS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-24SenateCS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2021-03-11SenateNow in Health Policy
2021-03-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-09SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/09/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Health Policy; Appropriations
2021-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H987 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1080, 1st Eng.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
386212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56934Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56937Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56938Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56939Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56942Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56943Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56944Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Amendment/859156/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Amendment/226212/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Amendment/465114/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Analyses/2021s01080.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Vote/SenateVote_s01080e1004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Vote/HouseVote_s01080e1352.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Vote/2021-03-09%200900AM~S01080%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Vote/2021-03-24%201130AM~S01080%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1080/Vote/2021-04-16%200900AM~S01080%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback