FL H0959 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides requirements for unit owner's policy assessment coverage; provides requirements for unit owner property insurance policies; provides exemption for certain buildings from requirement to install manual fire alarm system as required in Life Safety Code; deletes certain meeting requirements for board of condominium; revises requirements for condominium unit owner's property insurance policy, etc.
Title
Residential Properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) | |
2010-03-28 | Now in Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC) -HJ 00416 | |
2010-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00403 | |
2010-03-22 | CS by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 9 NAYS 2 -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00085 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-02-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0561 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 1196; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110) -HJ 01163
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H1035 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S1172 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00931; Substituted CS/HB 1035 -SJ 00931; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00931
S1196 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-174; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110)
S1222 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - CS combines this bill with SB 1196 -SJ 00189; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00189
S1270 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S1272 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
H1317 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0115 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0419 (Similar To) 2010-02-22 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00041
S0398 (Similar To) 2009-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0864 (Similar To) 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00268
S2458 (Similar To) 2010-03-23 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary -SJ 00321; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00321
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H1035 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S1172 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00931; Substituted CS/HB 1035 -SJ 00931; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00931
S1196 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-174; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110)
S1222 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - CS combines this bill with SB 1196 -SJ 00189; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00189
S1270 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S1272 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
H1317 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0115 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0419 (Similar To) 2010-02-22 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00041
S0398 (Similar To) 2009-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0864 (Similar To) 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00268
S2458 (Similar To) 2010-03-23 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary -SJ 00321; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00321
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0553 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 714 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0633 | 0215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 1165 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 314 | New Code | See Bill Text |