FL S0864 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides certain inspection powers for employees of the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes. Requires the DBPR to enter an order permanently revoking the license of a community association manager under certain circumstances. Authorizes an association to suspend, for a reasonable time, the right of a unit owner or the unit's occupant, licensee, or invitee to use certain common elements under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Community Associations [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00268 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00062 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-12-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0115 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0327 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0337 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H0561 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 1196; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110) -HJ 01163
S0398 (Similar To) 2009-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0840 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0968 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S1196 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-174; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110)
S1222 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - CS combines this bill with SB 1196 -SJ 00189; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00189
H0419 (Similar To) 2010-02-22 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00041
H1317 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0327 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
H0337 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
H0561 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 1196; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174), CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110) -HJ 01163
S0398 (Similar To) 2009-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0840 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0968 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
S1196 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-174; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110)
S1222 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - CS combines this bill with SB 1196 -SJ 00189; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 00189
H0419 (Similar To) 2010-02-22 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00041
H1317 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0020 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0468 | 436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 1265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 5012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 50151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 1064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 1224 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 1265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 3025 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 3026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0719 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 3065 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 3068 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0720 | 314 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0721 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |