FL H0951 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Office of Safe Schools to establish hotline & use data for specified purposes; provides requirements for reporting specified threats & incidents by threat assessment teams & school principals; establishes Safe Schools Grant Program; provides for administration, funding, & requirements for such program.
Title
Reporting of School Safety Issues
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] | Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. Ben Diamond [D] |
Rep. Andrew Learned [D] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1284 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 1494 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/951 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/951/BillText/Filed/PDF |