FL S1284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Parents Need to Know Act"; requiring data from a specified hotline to be included in a certain centralized integrated data repository; requiring the Office of Safe Schools to establish and operate a hotline for specified purposes; requiring threat assessment teams to report all threats and incidents to the school principal; establishing the Safe Schools Grant Program; providing for funding and administration of the program, etc.
Title
Reporting of School Safety Issues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H951 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 1494 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1284 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1284/BillText/Filed/HTML |