FL H0951 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that posttraumatic stress disorder suffered by correctional officer is occupational disease compensable by workers' compensation benefits; specifies that certain benefits do not require physical injury & are not subject to certain apportionment or limitations; requires DFS to adopt certain rules; requires employing agency to provide specified mental health training.
Title
Workers' Compensation Benefits for Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1240 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/951 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/951/BillText/Filed/PDF |