FL H0945 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies requirements for purpose & scope of emergency orders; provides for automatic expiration of emergency orders; authorizes extension of emergency orders for specified duration; requires majority vote of governing body for such extension; authorizes governing body to convene & vote remotely; authorizes Governor & Legislature to invalidate emergency orders upon certain determinations; prohibits issuance of certain emergency orders.
Title
Emergency Manangement Powers of Political Subdivisions
Sponsors
House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Committee | House Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee | Rep. Bob Rommel [R] | Rep. Alex Andrade [R] |
Rep. Lauren Melo [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8) |
2021-04-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-06 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-12 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1924 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
H7047 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8
H7047 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8