FL S2006 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Legislative Budget Commission to convene to transfer certain funds to the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund; requiring that the state comprehensive emergency management plan provide for certain public health emergency communications and include the Department of Health's public health emergency plan; redefining the term "essentials" to include personal protective equipment used during public health emergencies; specifying requirements for the purpose and scope of emergency orders; authorizing the Governor to invalidate certain emergency orders; revising the duties of the State Health Officer during a declared public health emergency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#434 (Y: 78 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#354 (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Chapter No. 2021-8
2021-05-03 Approved by Governor
2021-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-29HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-29SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 78, NAYS 36
2021-04-29HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 364950 Concur
2021-04-29HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-29HouseIn Messages
2021-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 15
2021-04-29SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended (783711)
2021-04-29SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed (941618)
2021-04-29SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (364950)
2021-04-28SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 76, NAYS 40
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 783711 adopted
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 783711 filed
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-22HouseIn Messages
2021-04-22SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 9
2021-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-21SenateOrdered engrossed
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) adopted (970074)
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-07SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2021-04-07SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-06SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2021-04-01SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-01SenateNow in Rules
2021-04-01SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-01SenateCS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2021-03-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-16SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations; Rules
2021-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1353 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H7047 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S1760 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
H1595 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S1892 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
H945 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S1924 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252359Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2523611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252365Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40611Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/723756/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/128472/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/880726/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/970074/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/680134/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Amendment/330036/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Analyses/2021s02006.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/SenateVote_s02006e1004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/HouseVote_s02006e1354.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/SenateVote_s02006e1044.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/SenateVote_s02006e1045.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/HouseVote_s02006e1434.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/2021-03-16%200330PM~S02006%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/2021-04-01%200900AM~S02006%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/2006/Vote/2021-04-06%200930AM~S02006%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback