FL H0917 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases surcharge assessed for violations of specified criminal offenses; provides for deposit of additional funds into Domestic Violence Trust Fund.
Title
Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Kelly [R] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-04-02 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Not considered | |
2010-03-29 | Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00418 | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00418 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00082 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development | |
2010-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1040 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
S0400 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
H0229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
S0400 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
H0229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)