FL H0901 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases amount of credited service member is entitled to each year; revises review procedures at hearing for denial of request for pension benefits; revises assumed investment rate of return percentage to conform to increase in amount of credited service member is entitled to each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of West Palm Beach, Palm Beach County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#207 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-174
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-21HouseCS/CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-20HouseCS/CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-14HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback