FL H0875 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed
Pending: House Health And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Statewide Task Force on Opioid Drug Abuse; provides purpose, membership, & duties; requires reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Taskforce on Opioid Drug Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-03-20HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-20HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1658 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback