FL H0865 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises teacher salary increase allocation; deletes definitions of the terms "grandfathered salary schedule" & "performance salary schedule"; authorizes, rather than requires, district school boards to provide salary adjustments for certain personnel related to performance.
Title
School Administrator and Instructional Personnel Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1610 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/865 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/865/BillText/Filed/PDF |