FL H0853 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises period during which absentee ballots may be canvassed; revises instructions to electors provided with absentee ballots to revise date by which absentee elector must submit updated signature in voter registration file used to verify signature on absentee ballot voter's certificate, to conform.
Title
Canvassing of Absentee Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1058 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/853 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0853/BillText/Filed/PDF |