FL H0847 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Now in Commerce Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preempts to state the right to regulate conditions of employment by an employer; voids existing ordinance, regulation, or policy that is preempted by act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption of Conditions of Employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-20HouseNow in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S432 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Now in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
218077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback