FL S0432 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Now in Community Affairs
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a political subdivision from establishing, mandating, or otherwise requiring an employer to offer conditions of employment not otherwise required by state or federal law; specifying that certain requirements related to minimum wage and other conditions of employment are expressly preempted to the state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Conditions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H847 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Now in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
218077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback