FL H0827 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts allocate certain amount of specified funds to programs that prepare students to enroll in AICE courses; requires such funds be spent on specified costs; requires school districts to distribute specified bonuses to certain teachers providing pre-AICE instruction; requires bonuses based on student's score on AICE examination to be paid to all AICE teachers.
Title
School District Funding
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Hawkins [R] | Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Rep. Alejandro Rizo [R] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#227 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#227 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Chapter No. 2021-84 | |
2021-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-22 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for SB 918 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S918 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 827 (Ch. 2021-84)