FL H0827 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to review & adoption of instructional materials, dual enrollment programs, School Community Professional Development Act, & statewide standardized assessments; provides contingent appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional Support

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-19HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2018-02-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-15HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-13HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-16HouseCS referred to Education Committee
2018-01-16HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-11HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-12-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1644 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S1064 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100630Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101298Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback