FL S1064 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the contents of a postsecondary institution and private school dual enrollment articulation agreement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dual Enrollment Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education
2018-01-29SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
2017-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
H827 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback