FL H0825 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises Next Generation Sunshine State Standards; provides that NGSSS are minimum baseline core content standards for K-12 public schools; requires each school district to adopt standards equivalent to or better than NGSSS; revises content requirements for such standards; revises requirements for certain instructional materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational Standards For K-12 Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S966 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006283Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback