FL S0966 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the Next Generation Sunshine State Standards; providing that such standards are the minimum baseline core content standards for K-12 public schools; revising the requirements for instructional materials that a district school superintendent annually certifies, etc.
Title
Educational Standards for K-12 Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H825 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/966 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/966/BillText/Filed/HTML |