FL H0801 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies methodology by which certain timeshare units must be valued in certain tax appeals; provides that methodology meets constitutional mandate for just valuation.
Title
Valuation of Timeshare Units
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-17 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1132 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries