FL H0777 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires OPPAGA to conduct study to determine average rates, charges, & expenses of providing electricity; specifies requirements for study; directs Office of Public Counsel & PSC to provide assistance in obtaining required information as requested; requires report to be provided to Legislature by specified date.
Title
Electric Power Rate Study
Sponsors
Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/777 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0777/BillText/Filed/PDF |