FL H0769 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts trust funds administered by the Department of Veterans' Affairs from service charge representing estimated pro rata share of cost of general government paid from General Revenue Fund.
Title
Trust Funds of Department of Veterans' Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Healthy Families Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0906 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/769 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0769/BillText/Filed/PDF |