FL H0733 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHSMV to develop The Villages: May All Your Dreams Come True license plate; provides for distribution & use of fees collected from sale of plate.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
Rep. John Temple [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-12-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H403 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Ordered enrolled
S434 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 403
S434 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 403