FL S0434 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a certain discontinuation requirement for specialty license plates does not apply to collegiate license plates; providing that collegiate license plates are not subject to specified presale requirements for specialty license plates; authorizing certain entities to resubmit discontinued collegiate license plates for reauthorization by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; revising the distribution of proceeds for the Live The Dream license plate; directing the department to develop certain specialty license plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-04SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 403
2024-03-04SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 403
2024-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
2024-02-20SenateCS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2024-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-02-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-02-15SenateCS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2024-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-25SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2024-01-24SenateFavorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2024-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/24/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2024-01-12SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2024-01-11SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2024-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-10SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2024-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2023-11-28SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2023-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H403 (Similar To) 2024-06-28 - Chapter No. 2024-270
H105 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
H121 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
H407 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
H645 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
H733 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
H911 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
H1671 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
S60 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S244 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S512 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S858 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S934 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S982 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S948 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Amendment/420120/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Amendment/184804/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.pre.atd.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.atd.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.pre.fp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Analyses/2024s00434.fp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Vote/2024-01-10%201030AM~S00434%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Vote/2024-01-24%200200PM~S00434%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/434/Vote/2024-02-15%201200PM~S00434%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback