FL H0713 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increases threshold amounts for certain theft offenses; revises list of items from which theft of constitutes grand theft of third degree; revises circumstances under certain offenses by person with prior convictions constitute a higher degree felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-16HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-16HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-15HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-01HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-11HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-11-27HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S928 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback