FL S0928 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising threshold amounts and types of property which qualify for theft offenses; revising threshold amounts for retail theft, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H713 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3736055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
636238Amended CodeSee Bill Text
642038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8120155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback