FL H0709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "marksense ballots" for purposes of the Florida Election Code; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to furnish monthly to the Department of State a list of persons who identified themselves as aliens; prohibiting certain organizations from placing certain signage or paraphernalia in specified locations; prohibiting certain poll workers from wearing certain items in specified locations during specified times, etc.
Title
Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#768 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-05 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-05 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 2 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (477997, 614707) 801 |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-26 | House | CS by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-30 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S964 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H1049 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1484 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H1049 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1484 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 56075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |