FL H1319 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires supervisors of elections to enter into agreements with clerks of circuit courts to receive specified information; requires supervisors of elections to compare certain information with statewide voter registration system; requires DHSMV to furnish monthly to DOS list of persons who identified themselves as aliens; requires DOS to compare such list with statewide voter registration system & provide names of registered voters who are aliens to supervisor of elections of county in which voter is registered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration Maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#729 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 79 NAYS 34
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time 762
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-15HouseCS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time
2018-02-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-02-06HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-02-06HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-24HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H709 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback