FL H1049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain organizations from placing certain signage or paraphernalia in specified locations; prohibits supervisor of elections from paying organization in lieu of poll worker; prohibits certain poll workers from wearing certain items in specified locations during specified times.
Title
Poll Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#779 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-03-05 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-02-25 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2017-12-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1484 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H709 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H709 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
102 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |