FL H0695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care facilities to implement & maintain staffing plans; specifies minimum staffing levels for direct care registered nurses based on hospital or clinical unit setting; requires that patients be cared for only in hospital or clinical units that meet specified minimum staffing levels; prohibits health care facilities from using video cameras or monitors as substitute for direct observation; exempts health care facilities from minimum staffing level requirements during declared state of emergency; provides whistle-blower protections; creates cause of action; prohibits employers from taking actions with respect to employment for certain unionized staff.
Title
Delivery of Patient Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S376 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/695 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/695/BillText/Filed/PDF |