FL H0679 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises minimum licensing standards relating to transportation safety for child care facilities, large family child care homes, & family day care homes; requires DCF to suspend license of such facility or home when child dies under certain conditions.
Title
Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-11-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H111 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S88 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S88 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/679 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/679/BillText/Filed/PDF |