FL H0625 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires attorney representing personal representative in estate administration or trustee in initial administration of trust who intends to charge certain fee to make specified written disclosures; requires attorney to obtain certain signature; prohibits attorney who does not make such disclosures from being paid for legal services except in certain circumstances; provides that complexity of estate or trust may be considered when determining what is extraordinary service; requires court to consider certain agreements & written disclosures when determining reasonable compensation of attorney.
Title
Attorney Compensation
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] |
Rep. Daisy Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#419 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#230 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#230 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-145 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 767926 Concur |
2021-04-29 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (767926) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 954 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-07 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-07 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-12 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S954 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 625 (Ch. 2021-145)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
733 | 6171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 1007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |