FL H0579 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs FWCC, in partnership with Institute of Food & Agricultural Sciences at University of Florida & Water School at Florida Gulf Coast University, to study nutrient removal technologies & mechanical aquatic plant management techniques within Lake Okeechobee watershed; directs UF/IFAS to submit report to FWCC; directs FWCC to submit report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Aquatic Plant Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#674 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-06 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1128 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources