FL H0563 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises eligibility guidelines for Relative Caregiver Program; requires DCF to impose replacement fee for EBT cards; revises penalties for noncompliance with work requirements for temporary cash assistance; limits receipt of child-only benefits during periods of noncompliance; requires DCF to refer sanctioned participants to appropriate community services; revises consideration of income from illegal or ineligible noncitizen family members in determining eligibility for temporary cash assistance; requires DEO to develop & implement work plan agreement for participants in temporary cash assistance program.
Title
Public Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#678 (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#678 (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2016-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on Senate message list |
2016-03-07 | House | In returning messages |
2016-03-07 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (707276) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 750 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 82 NAYS 33 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (386609) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-09 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/09/16, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4 |
2016-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-11-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0750 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table
H1299 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
H1299 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 5085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |