FL S0750 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the consideration of income from certain illegal noncitizen or ineligible noncitizen family members in determining the family's eligibility for temporary cash assistance, etc.
Title
Temporary Cash Assistance Program
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 563 (Died in House returning Messages) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/14/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0563 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
414 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |