FL H0545 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Includes human trafficking as predicate offense for felony murder; prohibits permanently branding, or directing permanent branding, of victim of human trafficking; requires DOH to suspend license of massage therapist or massage establishment for specified violations in conjunction with establishment; provides that licensed massage therapist may not receive new or renewal license if applicant is convicted of certain prostitution offenses in conjunction with massage establishment; provides that licensed massage establishment may not receive new or renewal license if specified persons connected with establishment are convicted of certain prostitution offenses in conjunction with establishment; provides that minors may not be charged with specified prostitution offenses; requires person convicted of specified racketeering offenses to register as sexual predator or sexual offender; reenacts various provisions.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#613 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#613 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Chapter No. 2016-24 | |
2016-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 784 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-13 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-12-09 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-12-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-12-01 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 12/01/15, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0784 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
H4033 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S0874 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S1294 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-199
H1367 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24), CS/SB 1294 (Ch. 2016-199)
H4033 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S0874 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S1294 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-199
H1367 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24), CS/SB 1294 (Ch. 2016-199)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
60 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 0351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 4815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |