FL S0784 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "sexual abuse of a child" to delete a reference to a child being arrested or prosecuted for specified offenses; creating an increased penalty for causing great bodily harm, permanent disability, or permanent disfigurement; requiring the Department of Health to issue an emergency order suspending the license of a massage therapist or massage establishment if the therapist or a specified person connected to the establishment is convicted of owning, establishing, maintaining, or operating a place, structure, building, or conveyance for lewdness, assignation, or prostitution in conjunction with the establishment; requiring a person convicted of specified racketeering offenses to register as a sexual predator or sexual offender under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 545 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0545 (Same As) 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-24
H1367 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24), CS/SB 1294 (Ch. 2016-199)
H4033 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S0874 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S1294 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-199
H1367 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24), CS/SB 1294 (Ch. 2016-199)
H4033 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S0874 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 545 (Ch. 2016-24)
S1294 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-199
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
60 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 0351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 4815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |