FL H0533 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing insurers to refuse to insure or refuse to continue to insure an applicant or insured for failing to purchase certain noninsurance motor vehicle services, etc.
Title
Unfair Insurance Trade Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#903 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#564 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#564 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-153 | |
2018-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 102 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (245684) |
2018-03-09 | House | In returning messages |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (245684) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 756 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2018-01-16 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-10 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S756 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 533