FL H0519 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional requirements for health education; revises grades when students receive certain health education instruction; requires health education instruction include prevention of specified harms.
Title
Required Health Education Instruction
Sponsors
House Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] | Rep. Dana Trabulsy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#65 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Chapter No. 2021-83 | |
2021-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1094 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-12 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S554 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
S1094 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
H1303 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
S1094 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
H1303 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |