FL H1303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises required health education in public schools to include information regarding dangers & signs of human trafficking; specifies minimum requirements of human trafficking education portion of comprehensive health education curriculum.
Title
Human Trafficking Education in Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S554 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
H519 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-83
S1094 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
H519 (Similar To) 2021-06-14 - Chapter No. 2021-83
S1094 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 519 (Ch. 2021-83)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1303 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1303/BillText/Filed/PDF |