FL H0511 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to establish palliative care consumer & professional information & education program; requires department to publish certain information on its website; creates Palliative Care & Quality of Life Interdisciplinary Task Force within DOH; requires reports to Governor & Legislature; provides for future repeal of task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palliative Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-05HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-01-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0438 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381825Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback