FL H0501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces period during which action must be brought for latent defect in design, planning, or construction of improvement to real property; provides applicability.
Title
Limitation of Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-17 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 6 |
2015-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1158 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |