FL H0493 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides definitions relating to tourist development tax & tourist impact tax, transient rentals tax & convention development tax, & municipal resort tax; provides separate statement of tax requirements on various documents; revises requirements for charging, collecting, & remitting such taxes; authorizes DOR to compensate county governments for providing specified information; specifies payment amount; provides definitions relating to municipal resort tax; provides separate statement of tax requirements; provides exception; provides construction.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, & Other Transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#433 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-05 | Received -SJ 1018 | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time -HJ 976 | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 860 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-21 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-14 | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 762 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-07 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 585 | |
2011-04-08 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 600 | |
2011-04-07 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 8 -HJ 588 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/05/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/30/11, 2:15 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-23 | Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 282 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 -HJ 282 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 47 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 47 | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0376 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 0108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |