FL S0376 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides definitions relating to the tourist development tax, the transient rentals tax, the convention development tax, and a municipal resort tax. Authorizes the Department of Revenue to compensate county governments for providing certain information to the department. Specifies a payment amount, etc.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-05 | Withdrawn from Budget with subcommittee recommendation -SJ 968 | |
2011-04-07 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 462 | |
2011-04-06 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 -SJ 461 | |
2011-04-01 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 338 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 36 | |
2011-02-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-22 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Community Affairs (964784, 741410); YEAS 5 NAYS 2 -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/21/11, 1:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/11, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Community Affairs; Budget; Rules -SJ 36 | |
2011-01-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0493 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 0108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |