FL H0475 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOR to disclose information related to specified tax credits to DEP; provides tax credit to developers & homebuilders for certain graywater purchased during taxable year; provides cap on amount of tax credit; specifies information developer or homebuilder must provide to receive credit; requires DEP to make certain determinations & certify such to DOR; prohibits certification of credits after certain date; authorizes tax credits to be carried forward.
Title
Residential Graywater System Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) |
2023-04-12 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-11 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S358 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157
S7062 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157
S7062 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |