FL H0469 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19, refer to combined CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -HJ 00418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19, refer to combined CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -HJ 00418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
(THIS BILL COMBINED IN CS/H483 & H469) Specifies period during which sales of books, clothing, & school supplies is tax exempt; provides definitions & exceptions; authorizes DOR to adopt rules.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19, refer to combined CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -HJ 00418 | |
2010-03-25 | CS combines this bill with 483; CS by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | |
2010-03-23 | PCS on Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 03/25/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00044 | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-12-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0597 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Finance & Tax Council; Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00055
H0483 (Similar To) 2010-05-26 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-93
S0160 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93)
S0514 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (690214) -SJ 00903; Substituted CS/HB 483 -SJ 00903; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -SJ 00903
H0483 (Similar To) 2010-05-26 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-93
S0160 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93)
S0514 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (690214) -SJ 00903; Substituted CS/HB 483 -SJ 00903; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -SJ 00903