FL S0160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies a period during which the sale of books, clothing, and school supplies is exempt from the tax on sales, use, and other transactions. Provides definitions and exceptions. Authorizes the DOR to adopt rules. APPROPRIATION: $251,317.
Title
Sales Tax Exemption/Books/Clothing/School Supplies [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00021 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0597 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Withdrawn from Finance & Tax Council; Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00055
H0469 (Similar To) 2010-03-29 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19, refer to combined CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -HJ 00418
H0483 (Similar To) 2010-05-26 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-93
S0514 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (690214) -SJ 00903; Substituted CS/HB 483 -SJ 00903; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -SJ 00903
H0469 (Similar To) 2010-03-29 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19, refer to combined CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -HJ 00418
H0483 (Similar To) 2010-05-26 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-93
S0514 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (690214) -SJ 00903; Substituted CS/HB 483 -SJ 00903; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 483 (Ch. 2010-93) -SJ 00903