FL H0433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employer from inquiring into or considering applicant's criminal history on initial employment application unless otherwise required to do so by law.
Title
Discrimination in Employment Screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S380 (Similar To) 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S702 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S380 (Similar To) 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S702 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/433 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/433/BillText/Filed/PDF |